MD SB961 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring funds in the Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund to be used for the sole purpose of completing the development of Ward Farm Recreation and Nature Park until the development of the park is complete; requiring the Calvert County Board of County Commissioners to adopt a certain plan after the development of the park is complete; altering certain distributions of revenue from the State's admissions and amusement tax on electronic bingo and electronic tip jars in Calvert County; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2018-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Bingo
Calvert County
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Forests and Parks
Gaming
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Sports and Recreation
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Youth
Calvert County
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Forests and Parks
Gaming
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Sports and Recreation
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Youth