MD SB96 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-14 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-14 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the Community Parks and Playgrounds Program to make grants available to Charles County for the construction and maintenance of basketball courts at county parks with baseball fields; and requiring the governing body of Charles County to apply for grants under the Act and use the grant funding for the construction and maintenance of basketball courts at county parks with baseball fields.
Title
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Charles County - Basketball Courts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB732 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Subjects
Charles County
Community Facilities and Services
Forests and Parks
Grants
Municipalities
Natural Resources - Generally
Sports and Recreation
Community Facilities and Services
Forests and Parks
Grants
Municipalities
Natural Resources - Generally
Sports and Recreation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 5 | 9C-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 9C-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0096?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0096f.pdf |