MD SB959 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that certain contractors are jointly and severally liable for certain violations of the wage payment and collection law by certain subcontractors if the employee notified the general contractor, in writing, within 180 days after the violation occurred and the general contractor failed to cure the violation within 14 days after receiving the notice; prohibiting a certain obligation or contract right from being impaired by the Act; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - General Contractor Liability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-03HouseRereferred to Economic Matters
2019-03-25HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-21SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-21SenateFloor Amendment {633329/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFloor Amendment {813026/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-20SenateSpecial Order until 3/21 (Senator McCray) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateFavorable
2019-03-20SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback