MD SB956 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain retired employees of a county, municipal corporation, or county board to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits program under certain circumstances; and requiring the governing body of a county, municipal corporation, or county board to pay certain costs and to make certain determinations with regard to certain retirees under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation - County, Municipal Corporation, or County Board Retirees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateUnfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
2020-02-14SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB602 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions2508(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions2513(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback