MD SB956 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - First Reading Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program in the Department of Commerce to provide grants to nonprofit organizations and government agencies and to conduct other activities to promote Maryland beer; establishing qualifications for participation in the Program; providing an eligible applicant may not use a grant to satisfy any part of a matching fund requirement of another State grant provided to the applicant; establishing the Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {927779/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-13SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
2018-02-08SenateReassigned to Finance and Budget and Taxation
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback