MD SB956 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 to provide that specified grants for the Historic Greenbelt Theater may not terminate before June 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 - Prince George's County - Historic Greenbelt Theater
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Historical Matters
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Prior Authorizations
State Bonds
Theaters
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Prior Authorizations
State Bonds
Theaters