MD SB954 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Investment Committee of the State Retirement Agency to assess the use of minority business enterprises beginning July 1, 2022, and each fiscal year thereafter; requiring a certain certification agency and the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs, in consutation with certain entities, to initiate a certain study to evaluate whether remedial measures are needed to comply with a certain court opinion and any subsequent federal or constitutional requirements; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Use of Minority and Women-Owned Business Enterprises (Diversity Among Asset Managers Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m. |
2022-04-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-04-07 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {553528/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB542 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Investments
Minorities
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Committees and Commissions
Investments
Minorities
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 21 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |