MD SB954 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the authority of the Maryland Board of Physicians to issue temporary licenses to practice radiation therapy, radiography, or nuclear medicine technology; repealing specified provisions of law referring to specified temporary licenses; etc.
Title
Maryland Board of Physicians - Authority to Issue Temporary Licenses and Radiation Therapy, Radiography, Nuclear Medicine Technology, and Radiology Assistance Advisory Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {444639/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |