MD SB952 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 639
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 639
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain seating capacity requirement for theaters in Frederick County for which the Board of License Commissioners may issue a license to sell beer and wine.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Theater Licenses - Seating Capacity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 639 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Frederick County
Theaters
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Frederick County
Theaters