MD SB95 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1011
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain investor-owned gas, electric, or combination gas and electric companies to require certain contractors and subcontractors to pay their employees not less than the prevailing wage rate for certain projects involving the construction, reconstruction, installation, demolition, restoration, or alteration of any underground gas or electric infrastructure of the company, and any related traffic control activities.
Title
Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-42) |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-15) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Favorable |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB174 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
SB1011 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed
SB1011 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contractors
Energy Matters
Fuel
Labor and Industry, Division of
Public Works
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Traffic Regulation
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Construction
Contractors
Energy Matters
Fuel
Labor and Industry, Division of
Public Works
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Traffic Regulation
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 5 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |