MD SB948 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removing the authorization to harvest oysters from the list of activities authorized under an unlimited tidal fish license; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to, by regulation, modify the total number of certain commercial oyster authorizations based on certain factors; for the license year beginning on September 1, 2020, requiring the Department to issue a certain commercial oyster authorization only to a licensee who meets certain requirements; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Commercial Oyster Authorizations - Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources4701(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback