MD SB946 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB636
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Passive House Pilot Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development to assist a nonprofit organization in partnership with neighboring high schools and institutes of higher education, to provide students with career and technical educational experiences through the renovation of residential properties to become passive houses; requiring the Department to solicit proposals from nonprofit organizations that feature certain elements; requiring the Department to give priority to certain proposals; etc.
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {594632/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB946 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Appropriations
Architects
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Budgets
Certifications
Construction
Economic and Community Development
Education
Engineers
Higher Education
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Students
Appropriations
Architects
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Budgets
Certifications
Construction
Economic and Community Development
Education
Engineers
Higher Education
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |