MD SB946 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-15)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing retirees who participate in a certain prescription drug benefit plan to elect to have a spouse or dependent child covered under a certain State plan; requiring the Department of Budget and Management, on or before January 1, 2020, to establish the Maryland State Retiree Prescription Drug Coverage Program that reimburses participants for out-of-pocket costs that exceed certain limits; requiring the Department to establish a Maryland State Retiree Life-Sustaining Prescription Drug Assistance Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-10) (Y: 121 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (134-4)
2019-04-03HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-03SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseDelegates B. Barnes, Lierman, and Anderton
2019-04-01HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-01HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-03-29SenateSenators Griffith, Guzzone, and Serafini
2019-03-29SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-03-29SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-03-29SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (120-10)
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments {424865/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-11SenateFloor Amendment {573521/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFloor Amendment {283826/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFloor Amendment {213820/1 (Senator Griffith) Adopted
2019-03-08SenateSpecial Order until 3/11 (Senator Griffith) Adopted
2019-03-08SenateMotion Returned Second Reading (Senator Griffith) Adopted
2019-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {929230/2 Report Adopted
2019-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-22SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0946&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0946f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0946t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0946e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0946_92923002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0946_21382001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0946_28382601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0946_57352101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0946_42486501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0946_43302001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0946_85302901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0946.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0946_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0500.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0946_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0920.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0946_85302901.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1087.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1198.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback