MD SB946 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Senators Smith, Brochin, and Norman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Senators Smith, Brochin, and Norman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified exception relating to law enforcement officers to the prohibition on carrying or possessing specified weapons on school property; prohibiting the carrying or possession of specified firearms on the property of public institutions of higher education; providing specified exceptions; providing that a violation is a civil offense punishable by a fine of up to $1,000; requiring the Board of Regents for the University System of Maryland to incorporate the current weapons practice into their bylaws, policies and procedures; etc.
Title
Gun-Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (85-53) (Y: 85 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (27-20) (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {163423/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (22-24) (Y: 22 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (27-20) (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {163423/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (22-24) (Y: 22 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senators Smith, Brochin, and Norman |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (85-53) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {104463/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-24 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (27-20) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Floor Amendment {623022/4 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Floor Amendment {713625/1 (Senator Eckardt) Withdrawn |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment {713625/1 (Senator Eckardt) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Floor Amendment {713625/1 (Senator Eckardt) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Floor Amendment {113720/1 (Senator Edwards) Adopted |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Floor Amendment {163423/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (22-24) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Edwards) Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Floor Amendment {163423/1 (Senator Edwards) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {878776/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Edwards) Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {878776/1 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Citations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Fines
Guns
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
State Universities and Colleges
State's Attorneys
Trials
Weapons
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Fines
Guns
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
State Universities and Colleges
State's Attorneys
Trials
Weapons