MD SB943 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Delegates Rosenberg, Dumais, and Smith
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Delegates Rosenberg, Dumais, and Smith
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exception for a specified person from the prohibition against carrying or transporting a specified firearm under specified circumstances; requiring a court to inform a person convicted of a specified offense that the person is prohibited from possessing a firearm; requiring the court to advise the person that specified proof must be provided to the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services that specified firearms in the person's possession have been transferred from the person's possession; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-49) (Y: 88 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Delegates Rosenberg, Dumais, and Smith |
2016-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-11 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senators Raskin, Lee, and Ready |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (88-49) |
2016-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {952710/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2016-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2016-03-29 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {748472/2 Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Dealers
Domestic Violence
Guns
Law Enforcement
Notices
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Transportation
Violence
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Dealers
Domestic Violence
Guns
Law Enforcement
Notices
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Transportation
Violence