MD SB942 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program in the Department of Agriculture to increase the viability of urban farming and community gardens and improve access to urban-grown foods; and establishing the Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Fund to provide grants to urban agricultural producers and qualified nonprofit organizations for the purchase and installation of agriculture equipment associated with water supply and irrigation and electric power access.
Title
Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-4) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {853727/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB855 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Appropriations
Budgets
Census
Economic Development
Energy Matters
Equipment
Farmland
Grants
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Urban Areas
Utilities
Water
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Appropriations
Budgets
Census
Economic Development
Energy Matters
Equipment
Farmland
Grants
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Urban Areas
Utilities
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 13 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |