MD SB941 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of slot machine to exclude specified skills-based devices located at specified family entertainment centers; authorizing the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to issue an amusement gaming license to specified family entertainment centers in Worcester County; authorizing a family entertainment center that holds a license to operate specified skills-based devices that award specified prizes; requiring the Commission to determine the value of specified prizes that may be awarded; etc.
Title
Worcester County - Family Entertainment Centers - Amusement Gaming Licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Admissions and Amusement Tax
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Property Tax
Sales and Use Tax
Sports and Recreation
Worcester County
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Property Tax
Sales and Use Tax
Sports and Recreation
Worcester County