MD SB94 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB168
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee, also referred to as the State team, to identify and address the factors contributing to suicide deaths and facilitate system changes in the State to prevent suicide deaths; requiring the State team to report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly; providing for the sharing of information with and confidentiality of information obtained by the State team; exempting State team meetings from the Open Meetings Act; etc.
Title
Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-0) |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {933829/1 Adopted |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB48 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
SB168 (Carry Over) 2021-03-20 - Hearing canceled
SB168 (Carry Over) 2021-03-20 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Death
Disclosure
Ethics
Health
Health Occupations
Liability
meetings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Open Government
Privacy
Public Health
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Communications
Data
Death
Disclosure
Ethics
Health
Health Occupations
Liability
meetings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Open Government
Privacy
Public Health
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 637 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1008 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 1009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 1 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |