MD SB939 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 444
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing an exemption for certain check cashing services from certain provisions of law governing the licensure of check cashing services; authorizing a person to provide check cashing services without obtaining a certain license by registering each year with the Commissioner of Financial Regulation under certain circumstances; requiring a person to obtain and maintain a certain identifier, and to provide the Commissioner with certain information to register as a check cashing service; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 125 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 444
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (129-2)
2020-03-18HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (125-1)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-03-16HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2020-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {487573/1 Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-02-07SenateHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB1196 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Financial Institutions12102(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12105(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12105.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12118(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback