MD SB937 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from selling or offering to sell alcoholic beverages that are sold in a powder or crystalline form for direct use or use in combination with water or any other substance; providing for a penalty of up to $1,000 for a violation of the Act; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Powdered Alcoholic Beverages - Ban on Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-23) (Y: 116 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-23) (Y: 116 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (116-23) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (112-26) |
2015-04-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {833995/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-04-10 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2015-04-07 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Madaleno) Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Madaleno) Adopted |
2015-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Bills
Penalties and Sentences
Sunset
Water
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Bills
Penalties and Sentences
Sunset
Water