MD SB934 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Purple Star Schools Program to recognize public schools that provide strong services and supports for military-connected students and their families; requiring the State Department of Education to administer the Program and designate a public school as a Purple Star School under certain circumstances; establishing the qualifications for the designation of a Purple Star School; authorizing a certain school to partner with a county board of education to fulfill certain program requirements; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
SB934 (Carry Over) 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
HB782 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-03 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
HB782 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-03 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Armed Forces
Counselors
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
internet
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Rules and Regulations
Students
Volunteers
Counselors
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
internet
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Rules and Regulations
Students
Volunteers
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0934?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0934f.pdf |