MD SB934 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 711
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, under certain circumstances, that a dentist who is a faculty member at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry and was trained at a foreign dental school be qualified by the State Board of Dental Examiners to take a certain examination; authorizing a dentist who passes a certain examination to apply for a general license to practice dentistry; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 711
2018-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-30HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-28HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {184032/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-07SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback