MD SB931 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Secretary of Health from considering certain drugs to be specialty drugs for the purposes of providing services under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; altering the definition of "specialty drug" for the purpose of excluding prescription drugs prescribed to treat certain conditions from the authority of certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to require certain drugs be obtained through a certain pharmacy and to provide coverage through a managed care system; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {497676/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB652 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
Subjects
Diseases
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health, Department of
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Safety
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health, Department of
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 15 | 118.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 847 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |