MD SB93 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the authority of the Department of Agriculture to charge a fee for a pest control examination retaken after the initial examination; requiring a person who operates a pest control business to register annually specified employees with the Department of Agriculture; establishing specified employee registration and renewal fees; and requiring the payment of a specified late fee under specified circumstances.
Title
Agriculture - Pest Control - Fees and Registration
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (110-27) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-20 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (32-14) | |
2010-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2009-09-24 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Commerce and Business
Examinations
Fees
Licenses
Pest Control
Registration
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Examinations
Fees
Licenses
Pest Control
Registration
Work, Labor and Employment