MD SB929 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain principal departments to develop and implement a procedure for determining whether the adoption of a policy, guideline, or regulation by the department would have or has had a disparate impact on racial minorities and for mitigating the disparate impact; requiring that the procedure include a certain framework, certain indicators, data collection and reporting, and certain staff training; authorizing the departments to hire staff or consultants using certain resources to implement the Act; etc.
Title
State Policies, Guidelines, and Regulations - Mitigation of Disparate Impacts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Data
Discrimination
Education, State Department of
Health, Department of
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Job Training
Minorities
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Work, Labor and Employment
Discrimination
Education, State Department of
Health, Department of
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Job Training
Minorities
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Work, Labor and Employment