MD SB929 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the organization that represents a majority of the standardbred owners and trainers in the State to apply to the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation for the reimbursement of specified expenditures not to exceed 2% of all open purses; providing that the reimbursement amount be deducted from the Purse Dedication Account; specifying programs for which reimbursement is allowable; etc.
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1) |
2015-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {105866/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator King) Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Associations
Attorneys' Fees
Auditors and Audits
Counselors
Gaming
Health
Health Insurance
Horse Racing
Insurance
Lobbying
Racing
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorneys' Fees
Auditors and Audits
Counselors
Gaming
Health
Health Insurance
Horse Racing
Insurance
Lobbying
Racing
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment