MD SB929 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the application of specified provisions of law relating to the protection of agricultural operations from nuisance actions under specified circumstances to apply to specified commercial fishing and seafood operations; exempting specified commercial fishing and seafood operations from nuisance lawsuits; authorizing an appeal of a local agency's decision on a nuisance complaint against a commercial fishing or seafood operation to a circuit court; etc.
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-9) (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted (34-12) (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted (34-12) (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Environmental Matters |
2014-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-9) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted (34-12) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Kelley) Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Appeals
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commerce and Business
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Nuisances
Public Health
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commerce and Business
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Nuisances
Public Health