MD SB927 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application of certain provisions of law prohibiting an institution of higher education from paying certain financial or other incentives based on certain success to exempt the recruitment of foreign students who reside in a foreign country and are not eligible to receive federal student assistance.
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Prohibition Against Incentive Payments - Foreign Student Exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-34) |
2021-04-12 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate J. Lewis) Adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {584931/1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |