MD SB927 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county and a municipality to impose a penalty against an alarm system contractor for the alarm system contractor's failure to register an alarm system under certain circumstances; authorizing a county and a municipality to impose a penalty against an alarm system contractor for the alarm system contractor's failure to renew an alarm system's registration under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Alarm Systems - Registration and Renewal - Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2018-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {494835/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Contractors
Counties
Counties - Local Laws
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Registration
Security Alarms
Time
Counties
Counties - Local Laws
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Registration
Security Alarms
Time