MD SB926 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to review and make recommendations on the Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility; authorizing the Authority to acquire a site or an interest in a site for the Facility; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $3,750,000 for the Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Fund; requiring the Hagerstown-Washington County Industrial Foundation to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 31 each year; etc.
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-5) |
2021-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {694267/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {839635/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1162 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Appropriations
Bonds
Budgets
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
General Assembly
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Bonds
Budgets
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
General Assembly
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 625 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 628 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 646.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 657.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |