MD SB926 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the greenhouse gas emissions reductions that the State must achieve by 2030; requiring the State to achieve net-zero statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 2045; requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt a final plan that reduces statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 60% by 2030 and sets the State on a path toward achieving net-zero statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 2045, on or before December 31, 2020; establishing the Climate Jobs Workgroup; etc.
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Katie Hester [D] |
Sen. Cheryl Kagan [D] | Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1425 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Subjects
Agriculture
Budgets
Buses
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Ex-Offenders
Flood Control
Health
Hearings
Highways
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Leases and Rent
Minorities
Motor Vehicles
Natural Resources - Generally
Pollution
Poverty
Public Officials
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Rural Areas
Salaries and Compensation
Solar Energy
Sunset
Time
Transportation
Trees
Unemployment
Urban Areas
Veterans
Weights and Measures
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Budgets
Buses
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Ex-Offenders
Flood Control
Health
Hearings
Highways
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Leases and Rent
Minorities
Motor Vehicles
Natural Resources - Generally
Pollution
Poverty
Public Officials
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Rural Areas
Salaries and Compensation
Solar Energy
Sunset
Time
Transportation
Trees
Unemployment
Urban Areas
Veterans
Weights and Measures
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 2 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1204.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1204.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1303.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1303.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 417 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3 | 602.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 4 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0926?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0926f.pdf |