MD SB926 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a holder of a Class B beer, wine and liquor license in Carroll County to sell wine under specified circumstances for off-premises consumption; and limiting to six the number of bottles of wine a holder of the license may sell to an individual at one time.
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Wine for Off-Premises
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-26 | Hearing 3/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-25 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Senate Rules |