MD SB923 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Replacing the term "landlord" with "residential housing provider" and "tenant" with "resident" in the context of residential leases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Residential Lease - Terminology

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
2020-02-18SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Occupations and Professions10206(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation8101(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations56B-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations56B-05(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations56B-06(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations56B-07(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations56B-08(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations56B-09(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations56B-10(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations56B-33(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment6801(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment6815(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment6818(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment6819(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment6820(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment6821(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment6823(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment6828(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment6836(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General191401.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development12303(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development12402(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development13104(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development41208(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7101(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7106(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7201(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7202(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7203(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7210(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7212(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7301(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7302(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7303(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7304(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7305(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7306(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development7403(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services5603(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety12202(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety12203(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14212(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety9104(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety9105(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety9106(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety9108(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7303(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7304(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7307.3(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7309(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11102.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11102.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11111(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11136(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11137(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11138(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11139(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property14128(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property14130(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property15102(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8212.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8212.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8212.3(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8213(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8214(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8215(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8216(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8217(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property85A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8603(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8-5A02(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8-5A3(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8-5A4(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8-5A5(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8-5A6(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20706(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property9219(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property9304(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback