MD SB923 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the purpose of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission to include the approval of physicians, development of a Web site, establishment of an application review process, and issuance of medical marijuana grower licenses; authorizing a medical marijuana grower to distribute marijuana at specified facilities; identifying patients and caregivers; requiring the Commission to report to the General Assembly on the level of competition in the market for medical marijuana on or before December 1, 2015; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-9) (Y: 127 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256
2014-04-07SenatePassed Enrolled
2014-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (44-2)
2014-04-07SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2014-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (127-9)
2014-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {146385/1 Report Adopted
2014-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2014-04-01HouseHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-28HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2014-03-27HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2014-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2014-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2014-03-26SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2014-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {578876/2
2014-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2014-02-25SenateHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-31SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0923&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0923f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0923t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0923e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_256_sb0923e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0923_57887602.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0923_14638501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0003/sb0923.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/sb0923_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/sb0923_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0923,s-0745&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0923,s-1213&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0923,h-1271&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback