MD SB922 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Awarding a diminution credit of 60 days to reduce the term of confinement of an inmate if the inmate successfully obtains a certain educational certificate, diploma, or degree; prohibiting an inmate serving a sentence for a crime of violence from receiving a deduction of more than 40 days; prohibiting an inmate who is serving a sentence for a certain sexual offense from receiving a diminution of the term of confinement; requiring the Commissioner of Correction to establish a uniform system of deductions and participation criteria; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (39-5)
2020-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14SenateFloor Amendment {583126/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB812 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-14 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Correctional Services3706.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Correctional Services3708(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback