MD SB92 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing, from 160 to 100 hours, the number of training hours that a licensed physician is required to perform in a preceptor program rotation in order to qualify for a certain credit against the State income tax; clarifying the issuance of a credit certificate in certain preceptorship programs; repealing the termination date for certain credits against the State income tax for certain individuals who serve as preceptors in certain preceptorship programs and work in areas of the State with health care workforce shortages; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages - Eligibility and Sunset Repeal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-02-24SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-02-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-23SenateFavorable with Amendments {689437/1 Adopted
2021-02-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-12-22SenateHearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2020-09-22SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB1195 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2016(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10738(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10739(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback