MD SB919 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Racing Commission to issue a license to the Cecil County Breeders' Fair, Inc. to hold no more than eight one-day race meetings each year; requiring the licensee to deduct from the handle an amount not to exceed to 25%, and to pay 36% of the amount deducted from the handle, excluding the breakage, to the Fair Hill Improvement Fund; etc.
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2021-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {575069/1 Adopted |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {859036/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1259 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 11 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 11 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 908 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |