MD SB919 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from specified State insurance laws a self-funded student health plan operated by an independent institution of higher education that provides health care services to its students and their dependents if the institution files a specified report on July 1 each year; etc.
Title
Insurance - Self-Funded Student Health Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {837676/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Dentists
Emergency Bills
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Higher Education
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Students
Emergency Bills
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Higher Education
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Students