MD SB918 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Talbot County Board of Elections to have five regular members; requiring the members of the local board to be of specified political parties; and requiring that a vacancy on the local board be filled in a specified manner.
Title
Talbot County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |