MD SB917 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the maximum amount of total user fees, from up to $16,000,000 to up to the greater of 0.1% of the immediately preceding fiscal year's budgeted, regulated, gross hospital revenue or the largest amount determined for a fiscal year during the immediately preceding 5 fiscal years, that may be assessed on hospitals and related institutions by the Health Services Cost Review Commission.
Title
Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-32) |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (29-17) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {713526/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {713526/1 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2022-02-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB510 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Subjects
Assessments
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |