MD SB916 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "collection agency" under the Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act to include a person who directly or indirectly engages in the business of servicing a student education loan of any student borrower.
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Student Education Loan Servicers
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Debt Collection
Financial Institutions
Higher Education
Loans
Students
Debt Collection
Financial Institutions
Higher Education
Loans
Students