MD SB915 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a hearing on an appeal to a supervisor of assessments concerning the value or classification of a dwelling to occur no later than 120 days after the Department of Assessments and Taxation receives the appeal, unless the property owner requests a postponement; requiring the supervisor to give written notice of the final value or classification to the person who has appealed or filed a petition for review within 60 days after the hearing; etc.
Title
Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-08 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {669939/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Apartments
Assessment Appeal Boards
Assessments
Condominiums
Hearings
Notices
Property Tax
Real Property
Taxes - Property
Assessment Appeal Boards
Assessments
Condominiums
Hearings
Notices
Property Tax
Real Property
Taxes - Property