MD SB913 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Heat and Eat Program within the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program in the Department of Human Services for the purpose of expanding food access to households that are receiving or are eligible for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits; requiring the Department to study the feasibility of establishing automatic eligibility and approval for participation in the Maryland Energy Assistance Program for households receiving or eligible to receive certain benefits under State and federal law; etc.
Title
Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 363 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-27) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {177672/1 Adopted |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB101 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 362
Subjects
Energy Matters
Food
Food Stamps
Human Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Utilities
Food
Food Stamps
Human Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 5 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 5 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |