MD SB909 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an exception to the requirement that an individual be licensed by the State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators before the individual may practice in this State for a person who holds a license in another state and has certain experience; altering the qualifications for applicants for a license to practice as a nursing home administrator; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Nursing Home Administrator - Qualifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 9 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 9 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |