MD SB909 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the holder of a Class 1 distillery license to sell mixed drinks made from liquor manufactured by the license holder and other nonalcoholic ingredients, for on-premises consumption; authorizing a local licensing board to grant an on-site consumption permit to the holder of a Class 1 distillery license; authorizing a local licensing board to establish and charge a fee for a certain permit; limiting the license holder to the use of no more than an aggregate of 7,750 gallons annually of liquor the holder produces for mixed drinks; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Class 1 Distillery License – On–Site Consumption Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {764138/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Fees
Job Training
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Fees
Job Training
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations