MD SB907 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Law Enforcement Coordinating Council to prevent and reduce crime by coordinating and focusing State resources and ensuring interagency communication and intelligence-sharing; requiring the Council to prepare a certain comprehensive crime plan for the State or for each region of the State; requiring the Council to meet twice each year; requiring the Governor, or a designee, to attend at least one Council meeting each year; requiring the Council to submit an annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Crime Plan and Law Enforcement Councils (Maryland State Crime Plan)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-17SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2020-03-17SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (129-0)
2020-03-16HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (131-0)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {212115/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-03-14HouseHearing canceled
2020-03-12HouseHearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-10HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-03-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2020-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {838276/1 Adopted
2020-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB1579 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-25 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety2315(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety2316(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0907?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0907f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0907t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0907e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0907_83827601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0907_21211501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0907_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0907_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0554.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0858.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0859.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0890.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback