MD SB906 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified exception to the prohibition against the Somerset County Board of License Commissioners approving a license to sell alcoholic beverages for specified establishments located within 300 feet of a school, church or other place of worship, public library, or youth center.
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206 |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2015-04-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Churches
Community Facilities and Services
Libraries
Private Schools
Public Schools
Somerset County
Youth
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Churches
Community Facilities and Services
Libraries
Private Schools
Public Schools
Somerset County
Youth