MD SB905 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the State Highway Administration from issuing a permit for work to be conducted on State highways between 10:00 p.m. and 6:00 a.m. the following day unless a zoning official determines that issuing the permit is in the interest of public safety, health, or welfare; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Highway Administration - Construction and Maintenance - Permit Requirements (Nighttime Construction Noise Reduction Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2020-02-21SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-07SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB84 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation8662(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback