MD SB904 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Comptroller, in consultation with the Maryland Higher Education Commission, to conduct a certain study on designating certain periods each year to be tax-free periods during which an exemption from the sales and use tax is provided for the sale of certain textbooks purchased by certain students; requiring the Comptroller, in conducting the study, to make a certain presumption; requiring the Comptroller to submit a report of its findings and any recommendations on or before December 31, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax - Study on Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09HouseReferred Rules and Executive Nominations
2021-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-09SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
2021-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {499330/1 Adopted
2021-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-02-11SenateHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-09SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB792 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General11241(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback