MD SB903 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering requirements a pharmacy benefits manager must comply with when conducting an audit of a pharmacy or pharmacist; prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager from disrupting the provision of services to the customers of a pharmacy during an audit; prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager from taking specified actions relating to an audit of a pharmacy or pharmacist, with a specified exception; prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager from recouping by setoff specified money until conditions are fulfilled; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Audits and Reimbursement of
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (125-0) | |
2012-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-30 | Re-referred Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-25 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments 947774/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appeals
Auditors and Audits
Drugs
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Insurance Administration
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Physicians
Postal Service
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Auditors and Audits
Drugs
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Insurance Administration
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Physicians
Postal Service
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations